CO SB154 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-19)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the veterans one-stop center in Grand Junction, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations in the 2022 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Continue Veterans One-stop Center

Sponsors

Sen. Nick Hinrichsen [D]Sen. Tom Sullivan [D]Rep. Jennifer Parenti [D]Rep. Rick Taggart [R]
Sen. Mark Baisley [R]Sen. James Coleman [D]Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Larry Liston [R]
Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]Sen. Lisa Cutter [D]Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]
Sen. Thomas Exum [D]Sen. Bob Gardner [R]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]Sen. Chris Kolker [D]
Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]Sen. Janice Marchman [D]Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Byron Pelton [R]
Sen. Kevin Priola [D]Sen. Dylan Roberts [D]Sen. Robert Rodriguez [D]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]
Sen. Jim Smallwood [R]Sen. Kevin Van Winkle [R]Sen. Perry Will [R]Sen. Faith Winter [D]
Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]Rep. Judith Amabile [D]Rep. Ryan Armagost [R]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]
Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R]Rep. Kyle Brown [D]Rep. Marc Catlin [R]
Rep. Monica Duran [D]Rep. Regina English [D]Rep. Elisabeth Epps [D]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]
Rep. Lorena Garcia [D]Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Eliza Hamrick [D]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]
Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]Rep. Junie Joseph [D]Rep. Sheila Lieder [D]Rep. Mandy Lindsay [D]
Rep. William Lindstedt [D]Rep. Michael Lynch [R]Rep. Javier Mabrey [D]Rep. Bob Marshall [D]
Rep. Matthew Martinez [D]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]Rep. David Ortiz [D]
Rep. Rose Pugliese [R]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Marc Snyder [D]
Rep. Matt Soper [R]Rep. Tammy Story [D]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Velasco [D]Rep. Ron Weinberg [R]Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Jenny Willford [D]
Rep. Don Wilson [R]Rep. Ty Winter [R]Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]Rep. Mary Young [D]
Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]

Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-154 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-154 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-154 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-154 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-28 Governor Signed
2023-04-21 Sent to the Governor
2023-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-04-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-13HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-04-03HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-03-30HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-03-16HouseHouse Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2023-03-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
2023-03-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-03-10SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-02-23SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2023-02-15SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb23-154
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_154_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_154_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_154_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_154_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_154_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_154_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb154_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0154_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0154_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb154_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1172287bd4c21e068725895f0070e47c-sb23-154-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c81aa9741e5875b8725896e005092a1-sb23-154-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-154vote5efbcb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e14e98a18b3cb7628725897400570e73-sb23-154-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bc84451332b2445887258982004e75bf-sb23-154-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-154vote72f541

Bill Comments

feedback