CO SB154 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the 'Uniform Unsworn Declarations Act'.
Title
Uniform Unsworn Declarations Act Include Domestic
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Rep. Cole Wist [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-154, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-154, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-154 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-154, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-154, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-154 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/17/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |