CO SB153 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increasing internal election security measures, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Internal Election Security Measures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.043) (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.043) (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-18 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |