CO SB153 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning establishment of the southwest chief and front range passenger rail commission to oversee the preservation and expansion of Amtrak southwest chief rail service in Colorado and facilitate the development and operation of a front range passenger rail system that provides passenger rail service in and along the interstate 25 corridor.
Title
Southwest Chief And Front Range Passenger Rail Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-153 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-153 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-153 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-153 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-153 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-153 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government + Finance |