CO SB151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a cash fund for use by the department of transportation to fund projects that provide safe road crossings for connectivity of wildlife and thereby reduce wildlife-vehicle collisions.
Title
Safe Crossings For Colorado Wildlife And Motorists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-151 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-151 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 22-151 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-151 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-151 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 22-151 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |