CO SB151 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning department of education research to develop bullying prevention policies.
Title
Colorado Department of Education Bullying Policies Research
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Recede (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Repass (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Adhere (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: This is a conceptual amendment (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Repass (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Adhere (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: This is a conceptual amendment (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Adherence - Result was to Recede |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere |
2018-04-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |