CO SB150 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Marriages By Individuals In Civil Unions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriages By Individuals In Civil Unions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-150 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-150 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-150 to the Committee on Public Health Care and Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-150 to the Committee on Public Health Care and Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-08SenateGovernor Signed
2016-05-12SenateSent to the Governor
2016-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-05-11SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-05-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-09HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-06HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-05-03HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Public Health Care & Human Services
2016-05-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2016-04-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2016-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/27/2016 - No Amendments
2016-04-20SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/25/2016 - No Amendments
2016-04-13SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/20/2016 - No Amendments
2016-04-12SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-04-05SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2016 - No Amendments
2016-04-04SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-03-31SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/04/2016 - No Amendments
2016-03-28SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-03-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9473DB2DFBA67AFC87257F240063F6BC?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9473DB2DFBA67AFC87257F240063F6BC/$FILE/150_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9473DB2DFBA67AFC87257F240063F6BC/$FILE/150sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9473DB2DFBA67AFC87257F240063F6BC/$FILE/150_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9473DB2DFBA67AFC87257F240063F6BC/$FILE/150_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9473DB2DFBA67AFC87257F240063F6BC/$FILE/150_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9473DB2DFBA67AFC87257F240063F6BC/$FILE/150_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9473DB2DFBA67AFC87257F240063F6BC/$FILE/150_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9473DB2DFBA67AFC87257F240063F6BC/$FILE/150_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/57ECE467753B244387257F84006DE375
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F7A70A4F063D823D87257F84006DD7CD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/B0218B959126D47A87257FA4004FF512/$FILE/jour_108.pdf#943
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CE1CC29029A6C28B87257FA8006BE61C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/78AC273264AA20D187257FAB0068254B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/F7976AF3B68FF4C187257FAF0021C3E8/$FILE/My10.pdf#1365
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/78AC273264AA20D187257FAB0068254B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CE1CC29029A6C28B87257FA8006BE61C

Bill Comments

feedback