CO SB148 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the financial empowerment office in the department of law, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Creation Of Financial Empowerment Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-148 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-148, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-148, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-148, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-148, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-148 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-148, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-148, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-148, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-148, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-24 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |