CO SB146 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the "Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act" related to property held by a financial organization.
Title
Financial Organizations Unclaimed Property Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 20-146 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 20-146 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-146, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-146, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 20-146 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-146, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-146, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |