CO SB145 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a special license plate to commemorate the stegosaurus as the Colorado state fossil, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stegosaurus State Fossil License Plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-145 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 23-145 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 23-145 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-22 Governor Signed
2023-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-05-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-05-06HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-05-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2023-04-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2023-04-18SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-17SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-02-28SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2023-02-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb23-145
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_145_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_145_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_145_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_145_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_145_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_145_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/22CE1214EF4B740B8725899000727C0C/SB145_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb145_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb145_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0145_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0145_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb145_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7a7d01ad6a7aa4d48725896400749103-sb23-145-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a4c6a03040d34c7f872589910050a576-sb23-145-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a4c6a03040d34c7f872589910050a576-sb23-145-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-145vote55f477
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/51795bc56f22ca1b872589a30005984c-sb23-145-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/be863fcaa86cb09c872589a7004de09f-sb23-145-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-145vote0c23f6

Bill Comments

feedback