CO SB145 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the implementation of employment first advisory partnership recommendations to advance competitive integrated employment for persons with disabilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Implement Employment First Recommendations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-145 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-145 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-01 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |