CO SB144 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the provision of transportation services by a transportation network company not in connection with a business operated for profit.
Title
Public And Nonprofit Entities Rideshare Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Amendment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.007 (Amendment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Amendment B), as amended. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Reconsideration (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.003) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 22-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 22-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Amendment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.007 (Amendment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Amendment B), as amended. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Reconsideration (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.003) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 22-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 22-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |