CO SB144 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning allowing a driver of a motorcycle to proceed past a malfunctioning traffic control signal.
Title
Motorcyclists And Malfunctioning Traffic Signals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.002) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-144 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.002) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-144 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |