CO SB144 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of bicycles approaching intersections.
Title
Bicycle Operation Approaching Intersection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008 [Attachment C] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment A] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-144 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008 [Attachment C] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment A] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-144 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |