CO SB144 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the recommended continuation of the education data advisory committee by the director of the division of professions and occupations in the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Review Education Data Advisory Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-144 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-041 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-144 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-144 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-041 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-144 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |