CO SB144 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mounted Equipment Registration Tax
Title
Mounted Equipment Registration Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Rice [D] | Sen. Mark Scheffel [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-144 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-144, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-144 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-144, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-10 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-05-07 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-05-07 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-04 | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-27 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations | |
2010-04-26 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-16 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations |