CO SB141 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority to create an entertainment district, and, in connection therewith, authorizing an entertainment district within a county or city and county and permitting an optional premises to be included in an entertainment district.
Title
Entertainment Districts Counties Optional Premises
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-141 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-141 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |