CO SB139 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Vote to Override Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Vote to Override Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the extension of the credit for tobacco products that a distributor ships or transports to an out-of-state consumer.
Title
Extend Credit For Out-of-state Tobacco Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-139 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-139 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Vote to Override Lost |
2017-04-28 | Governor Vetoed | |
2017-04-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Pass |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/03/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |