CO SB139 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unwanted Horse Fund Tax Checkoff
Title
Unwanted Horse Fund Tax Checkoff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - move the bill to the House Finance Committee (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-139 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-139 to the Committee on Appropriations, without amendment (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - move the bill to the House Finance Committee (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-139 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-139 to the Committee on Appropriations, without amendment (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Pass | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider | |
2010-05-07 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-06 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-05-05 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-04 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-27 | House Committee on Finance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | |
2010-04-23 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2010-04-07 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-17 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Finance | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-05 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources + Appropriations |