CO SB138 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the modification of the salary categorization of locally elected officers in specified counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modification of County Elected Officer Salary Categories

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-138 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-11 Governor Signed
2024-04-04 Sent to the Governor
2024-04-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2024-04-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2024-03-27SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2024-03-26SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2024-03-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2024-03-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2024-03-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2024-03-13HouseHouse Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2024-02-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government
2024-02-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2024-02-21SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2024-02-15SenateSenate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2024-02-07SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb24-138
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_138_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_138_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_138_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_138_rv2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_138_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_138_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2024A/amendments/369D5325A95D246087258ADE00680429/SB138_L.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/fn/2024a_sb138_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/fn/2024a_sb138_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/32c93ef35e8ff85087258ac40067d400-sb24-138-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-138vote5a1b6c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/294615f5ff4d346587258adf006e9e82-sb24-138-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/294615f5ff4d346587258adf006e9e82-sb24-138-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-138vote5a423e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-138vote5acaea
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-138vote5adf38

Bill Comments

feedback