CO SB138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning bonding requirements for contractors that are a party to certain public-private initiatives.
Title
Bond Requirements For Public Projects Using Private Financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |