CO SB138 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
ASCENT Program Funding
Title
ASCENT Program Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-138 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-138 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-138, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-138 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-138, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-02 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-30 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Finance |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Finance |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Finance |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Finance |