CO SB133 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the provision of security by the Colorado state patrol for certain elected officials, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Provide Security For Certain Elected Officials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-133 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-133 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-133, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-133, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-133 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-133 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-133, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-133, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-25 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |