CO SB133 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the regulation of genetic counselors, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require License Practice Genetic Counseling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 25 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-133 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-133 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-133 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-133 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-133, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-133, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Governor Vetoed
2019-05-09 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-19HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-19HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-17HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-03-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
2019-03-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-133
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_133_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_133_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_133_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_133_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_133_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_133_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/65239b0b10b7b51b872583a8007ad1cb-sb19-133-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/65239b0b10b7b51b872583a8007ad1cb-sb19-133-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d3726f90ef83fb6c872583b40075eb6e-sb19-133-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/33d7fe3187a7366e872583c5004e4ab2-sb19-133-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/33d7fe3187a7366e872583c5004e4ab2-sb19-133-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-133vote824ff3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d2eb724b6cf535fa872583d80062386e-sb19-133-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7d8086d54ecc44f3872583df00714198-sb19-133-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b97b38df76d70997872583e1004d361a-sb19-133-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-133vote0cbbcd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-133vote6248e1

Bill Comments

feedback