CO SB133 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transfer Of Property Rights At Death

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfer Of Property Rights At Death

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-133 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateGovernor Signed
2016-04-26SenateSent to the Governor
2016-04-26SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-04-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-07HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-05HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2016-03-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-03-22SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2016-03-18SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/22/2016 - No Amendments
2016-03-17SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-03-14SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-02-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0610D37C7300E4C387257F530069A654?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0610D37C7300E4C387257F530069A654/$FILE/133_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0610D37C7300E4C387257F530069A654/$FILE/133sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0610D37C7300E4C387257F530069A654/$FILE/133_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0610D37C7300E4C387257F530069A654/$FILE/133_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0610D37C7300E4C387257F530069A654/$FILE/133_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0610D37C7300E4C387257F530069A654/$FILE/133_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0610D37C7300E4C387257F530069A654/$FILE/133_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0610D37C7300E4C387257F530069A654/$FILE/133_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F1C3768A3FB7486F87257F76007515DC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8A9B8A9C69EA1C8087257F760074EF85
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2450A29383AD3A9387257F760074E8DA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/23F138F227F4876587257F760074B437
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/6326992B2890FC9787257F80004CE76C/$FILE/jour_072.pdf#508
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4643FC3D2A2116A287257F8C005AEB63
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/1F001DCBC2B12C9F87257F8F004E59A9/$FILE/Ap08.pdf#753

Bill Comments

feedback