CO SB133 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Mandatory Licensure Private Investigators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory Licensure Private Investigators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-133 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment K) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-133 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment. Amend offered amendment J.001 to remove General Fund appropriation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 as amended by previous conceptual amendment to remove General Fund appropriation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-133, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-133, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002, which strikes everything below the enacting clause (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment D). Amendment L.003 amends prepared Amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-133, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002, which strikes everything below the enacting clause (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment D). Amendment L.003 amends prepared Amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06SenateGovernor Signed
2014-05-15SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-15SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-30HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-04-28HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2014-04-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2014-04-17SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-16SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2014-04-15SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2014-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-08SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2014-02-26SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2014-01-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A77F6AC902F65D5987257C3000063671?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A77F6AC902F65D5987257C3000063671/$FILE/133_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A77F6AC902F65D5987257C3000063671/$FILE/133sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A77F6AC902F65D5987257C3000063671/$FILE/133sjudfin_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A77F6AC902F65D5987257C3000063671/$FILE/133sjudfinapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A77F6AC902F65D5987257C3000063671/$FILE/133_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A77F6AC902F65D5987257C3000063671/$FILE/133_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A77F6AC902F65D5987257C3000063671/$FILE/133_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A77F6AC902F65D5987257C3000063671/$FILE/133_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A77F6AC902F65D5987257C3000063671/$FILE/133_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F05A77DC0D905BE087257C8C0001AF95
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4A93D6BD1834686C87257C8C00019DF7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3BEBDE5C073A19EF87257C8C0001B4F8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F05A77DC0D905BE087257C8C0001AF95
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4A93D6BD1834686C87257C8C00019DF7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3BEBDE5C073A19EF87257C8C0001B4F8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4CAE367669D900E087257CB400714FEB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2DDDB0DE3B05F78D87257CB40071452D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E4B2A69540C273F587257CB7004DFB14
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8AA772DFD955C54487257CB7004DEDAE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/240C3C5C6ADDED1887257CB7004E1934
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C1FC8B1C9441019D87257CC90010D9CE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/258C82747B97E22C87257CC90010462A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/12736A8C65C01AD287257CCA00656BDA

Bill Comments

feedback