CO SB133 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Distribution Of State Share Of Ltd Gaming Revenues

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distribution Of State Share Of Ltd Gaming Revenues

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 11-2. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 11-2. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-08SenateGovernor Action - Signed
2013-03-01SenateSent to the Governor
2013-02-22HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-02-21HouseHouse Second Reading Passed
2013-02-20HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-02-15HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-02-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-02-04SenateIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2013-02-01SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
2013-01-31SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-01-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E33E79E998A9C4C887257AF6007D9FF9?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E33E79E998A9C4C887257AF6007D9FF9/$FILE/133_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E33E79E998A9C4C887257AF6007D9FF9/$FILE/133_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E33E79E998A9C4C887257AF6007D9FF9/$FILE/133_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E33E79E998A9C4C887257AF6007D9FF9/$FILE/133_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E33E79E998A9C4C887257AF6007D9FF9/$FILE/133_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E33E79E998A9C4C887257AF6007D9FF9/$FILE/133_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/43B44D927AD8521E87257B040059953A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D58565A9C4C6C91E87257B1300543CE9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/43B44D927AD8521E87257B040059953A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D58565A9C4C6C91E87257B1300543CE9

Bill Comments

feedback