CO SB133 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Discipline In Public Schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discipline In Public Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-133 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-133 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-133 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-133, as amended, to the Senate Committee of the Whole (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-133, as amended, to the Senate Committee of the Whole (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-133, as amended, to the Senate Committee of the Whole (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-133, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-133, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-133, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-23 Governor Action - Signed
2011-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2011-05-18 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2011-05-16 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-05-06 House Third Reading Passed
2011-05-05 House Second Reading Passed
2011-05-04 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-05-02 House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2011-04-27 Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
2011-04-26 Senate Third Reading Passed
2011-04-25 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-04-19 Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-03-23 Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Legislative Council
2011-03-08 Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2011-02-03 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Legislative Council

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4573402A707373F18725781800719E8A?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4573402A707373F18725781800719E8A/$FILE/133_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4573402A707373F18725781800719E8A/$FILE/133sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4573402A707373F18725781800719E8A/$FILE/133sjudleg.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4573402A707373F18725781800719E8A/$FILE/133_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4573402A707373F18725781800719E8A/$FILE/133_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4573402A707373F18725781800719E8A/$FILE/133_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4573402A707373F18725781800719E8A/$FILE/133_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4573402A707373F18725781800719E8A/$FILE/133_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7358B53B0EDD64CF8725785C00740135
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/51BB984026083BB687257877006A7841
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7C589122DECD2B1687257884006D4FD8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7358B53B0EDD64CF8725785C00740135
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/51BB984026083BB687257877006A7841
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7C589122DECD2B1687257884006D4FD8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7358B53B0EDD64CF8725785C00740135
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/51BB984026083BB687257877006A7841
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7C589122DECD2B1687257884006D4FD8

Bill Comments

feedback