CO SB130 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning backcountry search and rescue services in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Backcountry Search And Rescue In Colorado

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Postpone Senate Bill 20-130 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-130 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Postpone Indefinitely
2020-03-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture
2020-03-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-06SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-01-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-130
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_130_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_130_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_130_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/640df8e12807d718872585060071d2a9-sb20-130-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3a1a3834643d48488725852300559679-sb20-130-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3a1a3834643d48488725852300559679-sb20-130-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-130vote58ddef
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/00738df95758ceb7872585750066c539-sb20-130-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback