CO SB130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning backcountry search and rescue services in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Backcountry Search And Rescue In Colorado
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Postpone Senate Bill 20-130 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-130 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-130 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |