CO SB130 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Methods To Collect Consumer Use Tax
Title
Methods To Collect Consumer Use Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-130 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-130 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-130 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-130 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-130 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-130 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-130 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-130 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-130 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |