CO SB128 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the administration of the nursing home penalty cash fund, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing appropriations.
Title
Modification To Administration Of The Nursing Home Penalty Cash Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Kolker [D] | Rep. Susan Lontine [D] | Sen. Joann Ginal [D] | Rep. Monica Duran [D] |
Rep. Edith Hooton [D] | Sen. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D] | Sen. Kyle Mullica [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-128 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-128 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-128, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-20 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |