CO SB128 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative Care Facility Reimbursement Pilot
Title
Alternative Care Facility Reimbursement Pilot
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-09 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-05 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-06 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services |