CO SB128 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Invasion Of Privacy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Invasion Of Privacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-128, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-128, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-10 Governor Action - Signed
2010-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2010-05-24 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-05-20 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2010-05-11 Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2010-05-07 House Third Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-05-06 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-05-05 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-05-03 House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2010-04-21 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-04-21 Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2010-04-20 Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2010-04-16 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-03-11 Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2010-02-16 Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2010-02-01 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Finance + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9/$FILE/128_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9/$FILE/128sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9/$FILE/128sjudfin.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9/$FILE/128sjudfinapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9/$FILE/128JUD_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9/$FILE/128_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9/$FILE/128_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9/$FILE/128_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9/$FILE/128_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93B6E93F55BF6DA9872576A80027AEC9/$FILE/128_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BB37A9288BB79F71872576CC00691F8E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4E89738D24D69E2D872576E30068CB62
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D50A4B04C370CB7B87257707004C7D41
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3F765E555FE159C5872577190001034B

Bill Comments

feedback