CO SB126 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmaceutical Transparency Act
Title
Pharmaceutical Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-126 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-126 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - refer to finance (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-126 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - refer to finance (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-06 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-05 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-29 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-26 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-16 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee on Finance Re-Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Finance + Appropriations |