CO SB124 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning adding to the public school facility construction guidelines a requirement to consult with the local electric utility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Construction Guideline Utility Consultation

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Governor Signed
2020-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-02HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-01HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments
2020-05-26HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 05/29/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
2020-02-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-06SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-124
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_124_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_124_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_124_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_124_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_124_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_124_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d8e1ee676d5df9e987258506006d0623-sb20-124-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-124vote59735a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d8e1ee676d5df9e987258506006d0623-sb20-124-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2981d1b3729e060a8725852900571b4c-sb20-124-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-124vote5d8f96

Bill Comments 750

feedback