CO SB124 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a correction to the 'Colorado Uniform Trust Decanting Act'.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Uniform Trust Decanting Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-124 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-124 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30 Governor Signed
2017-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-03-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-03-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-03-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-14HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-02-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
2017-02-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-02-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2017-02-07SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-01-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb17-124
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_124_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_124_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_124_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_124_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_124_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_124_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-02-07t140433z-sb17-124-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#175
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2017a2017-03-09t133149z-sb17-124-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#515

Bill Comments 750

feedback