CO SB124 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reduce Parole Revocations For Technical Violations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce Parole Revocations For Technical Violations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-124 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-124, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-124, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-124, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-29SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-14SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-14SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-06SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-05-05SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2015-05-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-05-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2015-04-23SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2015-04-22SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-04-21SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-17SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-02-11SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-01-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0FBB07461F36BEFB87257DB10065DA22?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0FBB07461F36BEFB87257DB10065DA22/$FILE/124_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0FBB07461F36BEFB87257DB10065DA22/$FILE/124sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0FBB07461F36BEFB87257DB10065DA22/$FILE/124sjudapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0FBB07461F36BEFB87257DB10065DA22/$FILE/124_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0FBB07461F36BEFB87257DB10065DA22/$FILE/124_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0FBB07461F36BEFB87257DB10065DA22/$FILE/124jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0FBB07461F36BEFB87257DB10065DA22/$FILE/124_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0FBB07461F36BEFB87257DB10065DA22/$FILE/124_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0FBB07461F36BEFB87257DB10065DA22/$FILE/124_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E9BD927A6D373E0E87257DE9007AB564
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A5125C99E9366DF687257DE9007AAC30
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/61A311CD0992B7FE87257DE9007AA065
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7AA12038E16D0A8387257E2A004BC4B8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/43091F526D296CBA87257E2A004BA1AD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/231C9EA645E3A68487257E3700790206
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F157DA8A99A329D287257E370078EF01
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/54F7D44825DD81F287257E3700785430
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/289B5F236F78811887257E3C000191B0

Bill Comments 750

feedback