CO SB124 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School Turnaround Leaders Development Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Turnaround Leaders Development Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-124 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-124, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-124, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-124, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2014-05-13SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-13SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2014-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2014-04-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2014-04-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-21HouseSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2014-04-17SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-16SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-04-15SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-02-27SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2014-01-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C16F2C8B3F5CF86087257C4A0075C89F?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C16F2C8B3F5CF86087257C4A0075C89F/$FILE/124_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C16F2C8B3F5CF86087257C4A0075C89F/$FILE/124sedu_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C16F2C8B3F5CF86087257C4A0075C89F/$FILE/124seduapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C16F2C8B3F5CF86087257C4A0075C89F/$FILE/124_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C16F2C8B3F5CF86087257C4A0075C89F/$FILE/124_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C16F2C8B3F5CF86087257C4A0075C89F/$FILE/124_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C16F2C8B3F5CF86087257C4A0075C89F/$FILE/124_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C16F2C8B3F5CF86087257C4A0075C89F/$FILE/124_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/282C5B0862C7280E87257C8C0080AEC4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6323B4A2351601A987257C8C0080974D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6323B4A2351601A987257C8C0080974D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/282C5B0862C7280E87257C8C0080AEC4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/53A040E43E4BBF3D87257CB7004C420C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/00A619705CF89A9087257CB7004C23AA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CF1E8781ECAFA82987257CC800742B64
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A4E7F7900AEE602D87257CCC007E22D8

Bill Comments 750

feedback