CO SB124 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Governor Action - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminate Regional Tourism Project Limit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate Regional Tourism Project Limit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-124 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-124 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-124 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-04 Governor Action - Vetoed
2012-04-25 Sent to the Governor
2012-04-18 House Third Reading Passed
2012-04-09 House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-04-05 House Second Reading Passed
2012-04-02 House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-03-21 Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
2012-03-16 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-03-15 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-13 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-03-09 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-02-16 Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2012-02-14 Senate Committee on Local Government Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2012-01-31 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/91BB69362CBE3B7B87257989005D0D34?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/91BB69362CBE3B7B87257989005D0D34/$FILE/124_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/91BB69362CBE3B7B87257989005D0D34/$FILE/124sapp_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/91BB69362CBE3B7B87257989005D0D34/$FILE/124_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/91BB69362CBE3B7B87257989005D0D34/$FILE/124_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/91BB69362CBE3B7B87257989005D0D34/$FILE/124_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/91BB69362CBE3B7B87257989005D0D34/$FILE/124_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/91BB69362CBE3B7B87257989005D0D34/$FILE/124_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/83B30A4F27B4D054872579A60060CCFD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/83B30A4F27B4D054872579A60060CCFD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F91022F16563112C872579BC00545A80
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/739085D66DDCB02B872579BC00531EBC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/39FC9634CA8D30D0872579D40072DBB1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/71698B6C05C61629872579D7007B200D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F91022F16563112C872579BC00545A80
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/739085D66DDCB02B872579BC00531EBC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/71698B6C05C61629872579D7007B200D

Bill Comments 750

feedback