CO SB124 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers Of County TANF Reserves

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers Of County TANF Reserves

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW amd (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW amd (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW amd (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-124, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-124, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-124, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-19 Governor Action - Signed
2011-05-11 Sent to the Governor
2011-05-10 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2011-05-04 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-25 House Third Reading Passed
2011-04-21 House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
2011-04-19 House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2011-04-06 House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2011-03-18 Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2011-03-15 Senate Third Reading Passed
2011-03-14 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-09 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-03-04 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-02-10 Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-01-31 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD828B1D5A6AB52C8725781600583E91?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD828B1D5A6AB52C8725781600583E91/$FILE/124_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD828B1D5A6AB52C8725781600583E91/$FILE/124sfin_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD828B1D5A6AB52C8725781600583E91/$FILE/124sfinapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD828B1D5A6AB52C8725781600583E91/$FILE/124_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD828B1D5A6AB52C8725781600583E91/$FILE/124_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD828B1D5A6AB52C8725781600583E91/$FILE/124_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD828B1D5A6AB52C8725781600583E91/$FILE/124_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD828B1D5A6AB52C8725781600583E91/$FILE/124_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8115C78E325A283887257833006717DF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/82EFA54F5C7D2B378725784900520907
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AB6D8E2C269C63CD8725786A007406AD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5BB0F72BAA991EDA87257877004E5E63
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8115C78E325A283887257833006717DF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/82EFA54F5C7D2B378725784900520907
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AB6D8E2C269C63CD8725786A007406AD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5BB0F72BAA991EDA87257877004E5E63
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8115C78E325A283887257833006717DF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/82EFA54F5C7D2B378725784900520907
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AB6D8E2C269C63CD8725786A007406AD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5BB0F72BAA991EDA87257877004E5E63

Bill Comments 750

feedback