CO SB124 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Michael Skolnik Med Transparency 2010
Title
Michael Skolnik Med Transparency 2010
Sponsors
Sen. Morgan Carroll [D] | Rep. Su Ryden [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-124, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - refer to Finance (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-124, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-124, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - refer to Finance (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-124, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-10 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-07 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-07 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-04 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-27 | House Committee on Finance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | |
2010-04-12 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Finance + Appropriations | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee on Finance Re-Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Finance + Appropriations |