CO SB123 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning asbestos trust claim transparency.
Title
Asbestos Trust Claims Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-123 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-123 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-123 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-123 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-123 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/22/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/15/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |