CO SB122 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the bulk purchase of opiate antagonists pursuant to a standing order.
Title
Opiate Antagonist Bulk Purchase And Standing Orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-122 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-122 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-122 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-122 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |