CO SB122 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the duties of the fallen heroes memorial commission, and, in connection therewith, repealing the commission and shifting all remaining responsibilities to the state capitol building advisory committee.
Title
Repeal Fallen Heroes Memorial Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-122 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-122 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-122 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-122 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |