CO SB121 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning improving medicaid client correspondence, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Improve Medicaid Client Correspondence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-121 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-121 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-121, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-121 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-121 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-121, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-20 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |