CO SB120 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a supplemental appropriation to the department of public health and environment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suppl Approp Dept Public Health & Environment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-120 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-120 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-02-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-02-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-02-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-06SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-05SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-120
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_120_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_120_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_120_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_120_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_120_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_120_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/90c2610592f59a42872583980050f7c1-sb19-120-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-120vote5ef50a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/66ce730968dbefb58725839f0050db57-sb19-120-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-120vote5aa3c6

Bill Comments

feedback