CO SB120 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prepaid Wireless Telephone 911 Surcharge
Title
Prepaid Wireless Telephone 911 Surcharge
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Rice [D] | Sen. Al White [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-120 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-120, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-120 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-120, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-04 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-29 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-28 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-27 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-23 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-06 | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Appropriations | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-05 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |