CO SB119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-10)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-10)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increasing access in high school to high-quality credentials within the career development success program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Increasing Access To High-Quality Credentials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-119, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-119 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-119, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-119, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-119, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-119 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-119, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-119, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |