CO SB119 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - House Committee on Health & Insurance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - House Committee on Health & Insurance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expanding the Canadian prescription drug importation program to include prescription drug suppliers from nations other than Canada upon the enactment of legislation by the United States congress authorizing such practice.
Title
Expand Canadian Prescription Drug Import Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Postpone Senate Bill 20-119 indefinitely. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-02-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/25/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |